HomeMy WebLinkAboutGeneral Election BOARD OF ELECTIONS Commissioners
AYNE T.ROGERS
a COUNTY OF SUFFOLK WANrrAS.KATZ
PO BOX 700
YAPHANK NY 11980-0700 Deputy Commissioners
�♦ (631)852-4500 WILLIAM J.ELLIS
TTY(631)852-4FAX(6311852-4590 JEANNE C.O'ROURKE
540
November 20, 2014
Honorable Elizabeth Ann Neville
Town Clerk,Town of Southold
53095 Route 25
PO Box 1179
Southold,NY 11971
Dear Ms. Neville:
Pursuant to Section 9-214, of the New York State Election Law, we Wayne T. Rogers and Anita
S. Katz, Commissioners of Elections, in and for the County of Suffolk, hereby enclose the
name(s) of the respective Town Officer(s), elected in said Town, at the November 4th, 2014
General Election, and their place of residence, and the office to which they were elected.
Trustee Town of Southold
David R Bergen
9525 Nassau Point Rd, Cutchogue NY 11935-1620
Mailing: PO Box 1008, Cutchogue NY 11935-0639
Therefore, we do hereby certify that the foregoing to be true and complete copy of the name and
address of the respective Town Officer(s), elected in said Town, at the November 4`I', 2014
General Election.
IN WITNESS WHEREOF, We have hereunto set our hands and affixed the seal of the Board
of Elections of Suffolk County this 20`h day of November, 2014 at Yaphank,New York.
Sincerely,
l
ayn . Rogers Anita S.Katz
Commissioner Commissioner
OFFICERSBOARDS/COMMITTEES OF THE TOWN OF SOUTHOLD
SOUTHOLD TOWN BOARD (Elected)
Scott A. Russell Supervisor December 31,2015 -4 yr. term
Jill M. Doherty Councilwoman December 31, 2015 -4 yr. term
William P. Ruland Councilman December 31, 2015 -4 yr. term
Louisa P. Evans Justice December 31, 2017 - 4 yr. term
James Dinizio,Jr Councilman December 31, 2017—4 yr. term
Robert Ghosio Councilman December 31, 2017 - 4 yr. term
TOWN CLERK(Elected) & Registrar of Vital Statistics,Marriage Officer(Appointed)
Records Management Officer,Freedom of Information Officer(Appointed)
Elizabeth A. Neville December 31, 2017- 4 yr. term
BOARD OF ASSESSORS (Elected)
Richard Caggiano December 31, 2015—4 yr. term(elected 11/2013 to fill
remainder of D. Duffy's term)
Robert I. Scott, Jr. December 31, 2017—4 yr. term
Kevin Webster, Chairman 2014 December 31, 2017—4 yr. term
RECEIVER OF TAXES (Elected)
George Sullivan December 31, 2015 —4 yr. term
SUPERINTENDENT OF HIGHWAYS (Elected)
Vincent Orlando December 31, 2017 - 4 yr. term
TOWN JUSTICES (Elected)
Rudolph H. Bruer December 31, 2015 - 4 yr. term
Louisa P. Evans December 31, 2017 - 4 yr. term
William H Price,Jr. December 31, 2017 -4 yr. term
TOWN TRUSTEES (Elected—4 year terms)
Dave Bergen December 31, 2014 Dave Bergen will run in the 2014
James F. King December 31, 2015 Election to fill the unexpired term
Michael Domino December 31, 2017 If he is successful, he will then have
John M. Bredemeyer,President December 31, 2017 to run in 2015 for his own four (4)
Charles Sanders December 31, 2017 year term of office.
Bob Ghosio ran for Councilman and
OFFICIAL NEWSPAPER was elected, he then resigned from
The Suffolk Times his Trustee position. Da%e Bergen
was then appointed 'll his unexpired
term of office.
1
Updated 6/5/14
�® RESOLUTION 2014-218
* AMENDED DOC ID: 9582
THIS IS TO CERTIFY THAT THE FOLLOWING RESOLUTION NO.2014-218 WAS
AMENDED AT THE REGULAR MEETING OF THE SOUTHOLD TOWN BOARD ON
FEBRUARY 25, 2014:
RESOLVED that the Town Board of the Town of Southold hereby appoints Dave Bergen to the
position of Town Trustee, filling the unexpired term of Bob Ghosio, Jr., effective February 26,
2014 until such time as the 2014 election results are available.
Elizabeth A.Neville
Southold Town Clerk
RESULT: ADOPTED [4 TO 21
MOVER: William P. Ruland, Councilman
SECONDER:Louisa P. Evans, Justice
AYES: Robert Ghosio, William P. Ruland, Louisa P. Evans, Scott A. Russell
NAYS: James Dinizio Jr, Jill Doherty
OFFICERSBOARDS/COMMITTEES OF THE TOWN OF SOUTHOLD
SOUTHOLD TOWN BOARD (Elected)
Scott A. Russell Supervisor December 31, 2015 -4 yr. term
Louisa P. Evans Justice December 31, 2013 - 4 yr. term
James Dinizio, Jr Councilman December 31, 2013 —(appt. 2/12/13 to fill
vacancy created by A. Krupski's election as County Legislator)
Christopher M. Talbot Councilman December 31, 2013 -4 yr. term
Jill M. Doherty Councilwoman December 31, 2015 -4 yr. term
William P. Ruland Councilman December 31, 2015 - 4 yr. term
TOWN CLERK(Elected) & Registrar of Vital Statistics,Marriage Officer(Appointed)
Records Management Officer,Freedom of Information Officer(Appointed)
Elizabeth A. Neville December 31, 2013- 4 yr. term
BOARD OF ASSESSORS (Elected)
Robert I. Scott,Jr., Chairman2013 December 31, 2013 —4 yr. term
Kevin Webster December 31, 2013 —4 yr. term
(vacancy) December 31, 2015—4 yr. term(D Duffy retired 5/20/13)
RECEIVER OF TAXES (Elected)
George Sullivan December 31, 2015—4 yr. term
SUPERINTENDENT OF HIGHWAYS (Elected)
Peter W. Harris December 31, 2013 - 4 yr. term
TOWN JUSTICES (Elected)
Louisa P. Evans December 31, 2013 - 4 yr. term
William H Price, Jr. December 31, 2013 -4 yr. term
Rudolph H. Bruer December 31, 2015 - 4 yr. term
TOWN TRUSTEES (Elected—4 year terms)
Michael Domino December 31, 2013 (elected 11/2012 to fill Doherty's term)
John M. Bredemeyer December 31, 2013
David Bergen December 31, 2013
Bob Ghosio December 31, 2015
James F. King,President December 31, 2015
OFFICIAL NEWSPAPER
The Suffolk Times
Updated 10/8/13
RESOLUTION 2014-255
ADOPTED DOC ID: 9622
THIS IS TO CERTIFY THAT THE FOLLOWING RESOLUTION NO. 2014-255 WAS
ADOPTED AT THE REGULAR MEETING OF THE SOUTHOLD TOWN BOARD ON
MARCH 11, 2014:
RESOLVED the Town Board of the Town of Southold hereby amends Resolution No. 2014-218
extending the appointment of Trustee David Bergen to December 31, 2014 as follows:
RESOLVED that the Town Board of the Town of Southold hereby appoints Dave Bergen to the
position of Town Trustee, filling the unexpired term of Bob Ghosio, Jr., effective February 26,
2014 until such time as the 2014 _'__*:on__.4ts are available December 31, 2014.
Elizabeth A. Neville
Southold Town Clerk
RESULT: ADOPTED [4 TO 21
MOVER: Robert Ghosio, Councilman
SECONDER:Louisa P. Evans, Justice
AYES: Robert Ghosio, William P. Ruland, Louisa P. Evans, Scott A. Russell
NAYS: James Dinizio Jr, Jill Doherty